WV HB4219 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This purpose of this bill is to permit employees of educational services cooperatives to participate in the State Teachers Retirement System. The bill permits persons employed for instructional services by educational services cooperatives to participate in the State Teachers’ Defined Contribution Retirement System.
Title
Permitting employees of educational services cooperatives to participate in the State Teachers Retirement System
Sponsors
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Jill Upson [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] |
Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Stephen Wilson [R] | Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 205) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/3/18 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 205) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-14 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-14 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-19 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-19 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 7A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |