WV HB4213 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to adopt and implement the provisions of the Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act in West Virginia. This bill codifies standard procedures for resolution and determination of custody and visitation issues when a parent is deployed in the military or other national service.
Title
Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 336) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 112) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 112) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 336) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-02-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 112) |
2016-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB422 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - To Interstate Cooperation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 1 | 2333 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
48 | 1 | 2334 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
48 | 31 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 306 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 308 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 404 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 31 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 9 | 404 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
48D | 1 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 1 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 1 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 1 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 1 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 1 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 2 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 2 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 2 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 2 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 306 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 308 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 3 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 4 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 4 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 4 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 4 | 404 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 5 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 5 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48D | 5 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |