WV HB4187 | 2018 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Approved by Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


The purpose of this bill is to create the “Business Liability Protection Act”. The bill includes the right to limit possession of firearms on certain premises and definitions. It also provides for misdemeanor criminal offense and penalty. It prohibits employers from certain specific actions against a person when that person possesses a firearm legally, including a condition of employment. The bill provides a duty of care of public and private employers and provides for immunity from liability. The bill authorizes the Attorney General to enforce this statute, including the right to sue or seek injunctive relief; and seek civil fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Business Liability Protection Act


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 503) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 431) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 232) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 225) (Y: 5 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 224) (Y: 14 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 223) (Y: 22 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]


2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal
2018-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/18
2018-03-10SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-10HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 503)
2018-03-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-03-09SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 431)
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-09SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-07SenateImmediate consideration
2018-03-07SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2018-02-28SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-28SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-28SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-27HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-27HousePassed House (Roll No. 232)
2018-02-27HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-27HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-26HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-26HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 225)
2018-02-26HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 224)
2018-02-26HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 223)
2018-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-26HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-23HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-23HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-22HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-09HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-09HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-01-18HouseTo House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-18HouseTo Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Judiciary
2018-01-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB484 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - To Judiciary


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61714Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00223.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00224.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00225.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00232.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0431.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00503.pdf

Bill Comments