WV HB4186 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that guaranteed asset protection waivers are not insurance; to specify terms and conditions under which guaranteed asset protection waiver contracts may be solid in this state; and to provide an exception for commercial transactions. The bill also provides that it will apply retroactively to guaranteed asset protection waivers in effect on the date of passage.
Title
Relating generally to guaranteed asset protection waivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 490) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 500) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 310) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 69) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 500) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 310) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 69) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2018-03-28 | House | Became law without Governor's signature |
2018-03-10 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 490) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 500) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report received-House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-06 | House | To conference |
2018-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | House appointed conferees: Fast, Overington, Lovejoy |
2018-03-06 | House | House agreed to conference |
2018-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Rucker, Azinger, Beach |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 310) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 69) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-02 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-18 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-18 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |