WV HB4180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Director of the Division of Natural Resources to establish procedures and a fee schedule for individuals applying for limited permit hunts.
Title
Relating to wildlife resources
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Allen Evans [R] | Del. William Romine [R] | Del. Shirley Love [D] |
Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] | Del. Roland Jennings [R] | Del. Dana Lynch [D] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] |
Del. Danny Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 309) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 100) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 100) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 309) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 100) |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-07 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-07 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2018-01-18 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-18 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB345 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |