WV HB4178 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring calls which are recorded be maintained for a period of five years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring calls which are recorded be maintained for a period of five years

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 745) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 492) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 152) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 745)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-06SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 492)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 3/4/20
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2020-02-13SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-13SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-12HousePassed House (Roll No. 152)
2020-02-12HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-12HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-11HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-11HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-10HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-10HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-07HouseDo pass
2020-01-30HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-30HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseTo House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-14HouseTo Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
24613Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback