WV HB4175 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 93, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 93, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to home schooling
Title
Relating generally to home schooling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 154) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 157) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 27) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 157) (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 27) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 93, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-04 | House | Approved by Governor 3/3/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-03 | House | Approved by Governor 3/3/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Governor 2/26/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/26/16 - House Journal |
2016-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/26/16 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-23 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 154) |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 157) |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2016-02-03 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-03 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 27) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-02 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-01 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-01-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-01-29 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-01-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-20 | House | To House Education |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-20 | House | To Education |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB318 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |