WV HB4166 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain sex offenders from being in a supervisory position over children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting certain sex offenders from being in a supervisory position over children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 163) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 45) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-17SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-02-17SenateCommunicated to House
2020-02-17SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 163)
2020-02-17SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-17SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-14SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-13SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-13SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-12SenateReported do pass
2020-01-28SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-28SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-27HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-27HousePassed House (Roll No. 45)
2020-01-27HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-27HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-24HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-23HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-23HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-22HouseDo pass
2020-01-14HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-14HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4536 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
621226Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback