WV HB4162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to grant the State Conservation Committee the authority to enter into contracts for flood response, recovery and streambank restoration work and to maximize federal dollars by collaborating with federal agencies responding to flood events. .
Title
Granting authority to the State Conservation Committee to contract for flood response
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Dana Lynch [D] |
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 45) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 45) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Approved by Governor 2/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-27 | House | Approved by Governor 2/27/18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-21 | House | To Governor 2/21/18 |
2018-02-21 | House | To Governor 2/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Governor 2/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-16 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-06 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-06 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 45) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-05 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-02 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-31 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-17 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 21A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |