WV HB4155 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating generally to the regulation of plumbers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to the regulation of plumbers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - Motion to reconsider action on HFA Worrell rejected (Roll No. 182) (Y: 43 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 181) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 180) (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseFrom Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-02-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-14HousePostponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/17
2020-02-14HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-13HouseMotion to reconsider action on HFA Worrell rejected (Roll No. 182)
2020-02-13HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 181)
2020-02-13HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-13HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 180)
2020-02-13HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-13HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-12HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-12HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-11HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-14HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-14HouseTo Government Organization
2020-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21142Amended CodeCitation Text
21143Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback