WV HB4150 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit spoofing caller ID information that is fraudulent or misleading, with exceptions and criminal penalties.
Title
Prohibiting telecommunications and IP-enabled voice services from displaying the name or telephone number of the recipient
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 516) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 514) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 427) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 16) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 514) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 427) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 16) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 516) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 514) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 427) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/7/18 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 16) |
2018-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-24 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 6F | 501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 6F | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 3 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |