WV HB4146 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms used in the West Virginia Personal Income Tax Act; and specify effective dates.
Title
Updating meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms used in West Virginia Personal Income Tax Act
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 93) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 93) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 24) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 93) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 24) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-21 | House | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-15 | House | To Governor 2/15/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-15 | House | To Governor 2/15/18 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Governor 2/15/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 93) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 93) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-26 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 24) |
2018-01-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 23) |
2018-01-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-26 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Do pass |
2018-01-16 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-16 | House | To Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB266 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |