WV HB4144 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Tabled on 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Tabled on 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a date after which no further Film Tax Credits will be issued, while allowing tax credits issued prior to a certain date to be grandfathered, and winding up the operations of the WV Film Office.
Title
Relating to the elimination of film tax credits
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Tabled on 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-26 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, House Calendar, until 1/26/18 |
2018-01-25 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Do pass |
2018-01-16 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-16 | House | To Finance |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB263 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Chapter 227, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13X | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |