WV HB4122 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 167, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 167, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow an entity affiliated with an institution of higher education in this state with a regionally accredited program for the education of professional educators to provide alternative certification programs for teachers.
Title
Relating to alternative programs for teacher education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 218) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 30) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 44) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 30) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 44) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 167, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-12 | Approved by Governor 3/12/12 | |
2012-03-14 | Approved by Governor 3/12/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-12 | Approved by Governor 3/12/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-06 | To Governor 3/6/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-06 | To Governor 3/6/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-06 | To Governor 3/6/12 | |
2012-03-05 | House Message received | |
2012-03-02 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-02 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-02 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 218) | |
2012-03-02 | House received Senate message | |
2012-02-28 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 30) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-23 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2012-02-14 | To Education | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-14 | House Message received | |
2012-02-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 44) | |
2012-02-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-13 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-18 | To House Education | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-18 | To Education then Finance | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB218 (Same As) 2012-01-17 - To Education
Subjects
Education (And Related Subheadings)
Education -- Colleges & Universities
Education -- Salaries, Classifications, Leave
Education -- Colleges & Universities
Education -- Salaries, Classifications, Leave
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 3 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18A | 3 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 3 | 1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |