WV HB4121 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 185, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 185, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is related to authorizing the participation of local governments in a purchasing card program to be administered by the Auditor as chief inspector of public offices.
Title
Authorizing the participation of local governments in a purchasing card program to be administered by the Auditor
Sponsors
Del. Larry Barker [D] | Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Del. Joe DeLong [D] | Del. Jeff Eldridge [D] |
Del. Ronald Fragale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 185, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 486) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 24) | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee | |
2008-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-06 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-06 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2008-02-26 | To Finance | |
2008-02-26 | To Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 105) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/25/08 | |
2008-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-22 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-20 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-01-22 | To House Finance | |
2008-01-22 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-22 | To Finance | |
2008-01-22 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB320 (Same As) 2008-02-07 - To Finance
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4121&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |