WV HB4119 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a definition for an athletic director who is employed by a county board of education and is responsible for the planning, management, operation and evaluation of the athletic program for the school or schools to which he or she is assigned.
Title
Providing a definition for an athletic director who is employed by a county board of education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 323) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 79) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 79) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Clerk's note: Enrolled bill not presented to Governor as passed by Legislature; bill is null and void | |
2012-04-10 | Chapter 57, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 323) | |
2012-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-08 | Title amendment adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate reconsidered amendment and withdrew (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate reconsidered passage of bill (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent | |
2012-03-08 | Senate reconsidered title amendment (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | The bill still being in the possession of Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate requests return of bill from House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-08 | Title amendment adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent | |
2012-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Unanimous consent to amend | |
2012-03-08 | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee | |
2012-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-05 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-02 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2012-02-21 | To Education | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Passed House (Roll No. 79) | |
2012-02-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-20 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-17 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-17 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-16 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-15 | Do pass | |
2012-01-18 | To House Education | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-18 | To Education | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 2 | 1a | New Code | See Bill Text |