WV HB4117 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 84, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 84, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand eligibility for state minimum salary supplements for achieving certain national certification.
Title
Expanding eligibility for state minimum salary supplements for classroom teachers achieving certain national certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 84, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-28 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/20/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/20/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-20 | To Governor 3/20/08 | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 28) | |
2008-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) | |
2008-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-07 | Reported do pass | |
2008-03-07 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/4/08 | |
2008-03-04 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-04 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-27 | To Education | |
2008-02-27 | To Education then Finance | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 168) | |
2008-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 167) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-20 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-20 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-21 | To House Education | |
2008-01-21 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-21 | To Education then Finance | |
2008-01-21 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB480 (Similar To) 2008-01-29 - To Education
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4117&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |