WV HB4114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Ethics Commission to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Use of Office for Private Gain, Including Nepotism
Title
Authorizing certain agencies of the Department of Administration to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 157) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 120) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 119) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 120) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 119) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Approved by Governor 3/2/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/2/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/2/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Governor 2/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-24 | House | To Governor 2/24/22 |
2022-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 157) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 120) |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 119) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-18 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB275 (Similar To) 2022-01-17 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |