WV HB4104 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize, by legislative rule, professional licensing boards to exempt licensees who have been continuously licensed for twenty years or more from continuing education requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing professional licensing boards to exempt certain licensees from continuing education requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 53) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 52) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-16 To Government Organization
2012-02-16 Introduced in Senate
2012-02-16 House Message received
2012-02-15 Communicated to Senate
2012-02-15 Effective from passage (Roll No. 53)
2012-02-15 Passed House (Roll No. 52)
2012-02-15 Read 3rd time
2012-02-15 On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2012-02-14 Read 2nd time
2012-02-14 On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2012-02-13 Read 1st time
2012-02-13 From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2012-02-10 By substitute, do pass
2012-01-18 To House Government Organization
2012-01-18 Introduced in House
2012-01-18 To Government Organization
2012-01-18 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3017aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback