WV HB4103 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Approved by Governor 2/14/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to office of drug control policy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to office of drug control policy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 78) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 58) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 7) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseApproved by Governor 2/14/20
2020-02-17HouseApproved by Governor 2/14/20 - House Journal
2020-02-14SenateApproved by Governor 2/14/20 - Senate Journal
2020-02-10HouseTo Governor 2/10/20
2020-02-10HouseTo Governor 2/10/20 - House Journal
2020-02-10SenateTo Governor 2/10/20 - Senate Journal
2020-02-05SenateHouse Message received
2020-02-04HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-02-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 78)
2020-02-04HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-03SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-02-03SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 58)
2020-02-03SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-31SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/31/20
2020-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-31SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-01-30SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-01-30SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-29SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 1/29/20
2020-01-28SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 1/28/20
2020-01-28SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-01-27SenateRead 1st time
2020-01-27SenateOn 1st reading
2020-01-24SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2020-01-16SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2020-01-16SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 7)
2020-01-15HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-14HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-13HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-10HouseDo pass
2020-01-10HouseOriginating in House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
165T2Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback