WV HB4102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 274, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 274, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to opioid antagonists
Title
Relating to opioid antagonists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 687) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 686) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 490) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 84) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 83) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 686) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 490) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 84) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 83) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 274, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 687) |
2020-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 686) |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 490) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 84) |
2020-02-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 83) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-10 | House | Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-10 | House | Originating in House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 46 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 46 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |