WV HB4099 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminating the permit for shampoo assistants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating the permit for shampoo assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 425) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 232) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/7/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-04SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-04SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 425)
2020-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-02SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-02SenateReported do pass
2020-02-20SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-20SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 232)
2020-02-19HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-19HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-18HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-18HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-17HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-17HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-14HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-10HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-10HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-10HouseTo Government Organization
2020-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30271Amended CodeCitation Text
302711aRepealed CodeCitation Text
30273Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback