WV HB4097 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit nonpublic funding sources for election administration and related expenses without prior written approval by the State Election Commission.
Title
To prohibit nonpublic funding sources for election administration and related expenses without prior written approval by the State Election Commission.
Sponsors
Del. Josh Holstein [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] |
Del. Trenton Barnhart [R] | Del. Johnnie Wamsley [R] | Del. Riley Keaton [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 546) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 669) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 133) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 59) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 669) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 133) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 59) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 546) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 669) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report received-House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2022-03-11 | House | To conference |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | House appointed conferees: Steele, Holstein, Diserio |
2022-03-11 | House | House agreed to conference |
2022-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Weld, Azinger, Woelfel |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2022-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 133) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 59) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-17 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |