WV HB4092 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to foster care

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to foster care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-17HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-17HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-17HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-14HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-14HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-13HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-22HouseTo House Finance
2020-01-22HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2020-01-17HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-17HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-10HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2020-01-10HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-10HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2020-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB302 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - To Health and Human Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
491206Amended CodeCitation Text
492102Repealed CodeCitation Text
492104Repealed CodeCitation Text
492108Amended CodeCitation Text
492110Amended CodeCitation Text
492111Amended CodeCitation Text
492111aAmended CodeCitation Text
492112Amended CodeCitation Text
492118Amended CodeCitation Text
492121Amended CodeCitation Text
492124Amended CodeCitation Text
492126Amended CodeCitation Text
492127New CodeSee Bill Text
492128New CodeSee Bill Text
492129New CodeSee Bill Text
494604Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback