WV HB4079 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Commissioner of Agriculture to promulgate a legislative rule relating to West Virginia apiary law.
Title
Promulgating administrative rules by various executive or administrative agencies of the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 489) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 286) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 286) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 182) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 181) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 286) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 286) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 182) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 181) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/16/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 489) |
2018-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 488) |
2018-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 286) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 286) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 182) |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 181) |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-15 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-15 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2018-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB190 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 9 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |