WV HB4077 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide certain classes of property protections from creditor collections
Title
Provide certain classes of property protections from creditor collections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 163) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 163) |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2022-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |