WV HB4071 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Mask and Quarantine Option For Parents and Faculty
Title
Mask and Quarantine Option For Parents and Faculty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 281) (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Education |
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Education then Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 281) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2022-01-13 | House | To House Education |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-13 | House | To Education then Judiciary |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 8B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 8B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 8B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 8B | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |