WV HB4059 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 218, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 218, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting new Department of Health and Human Resources' Deputy Commissioners from civil service
Title
Clarifying that new Department of Health and Human Resources' Deputy Commissioners are exempt from civil service
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Larry Pack [R] |
Del. Guy Ward [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Don Forsht [R] |
Del. Phil Mallow [R] | Del. Roland Jennings [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 599) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 598) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 444) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 444) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 21) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 598) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 444) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 444) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 21) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 218, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 599) |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 598) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 444) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 444) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-19 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) |
2022-01-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 21) |
2022-01-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |