WV HB4058 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Real Estate Commission to promulgate a legislative rule relating to schedule of fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Estate Commission, rule relating to schedule of fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16HouseReported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4079
2018-01-25HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-01-25HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-01-15HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-01-15HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-15HouseTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2018-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB213 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6491Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback