WV HB4042 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring agencies exempt from some or all of state purchasing requirements to adopt procedural rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring agencies exempt from some or all of state purchasing requirements to adopt procedural rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 14) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20SenateTo Government Organization
2020-01-20SenateTo Government Organization
2020-01-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 14)
2020-01-17HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-17HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-16HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-01-16HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-16HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-15HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-15HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-14HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Government Organization
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5A112New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback