WV HB4026 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting businesses transporting scrap tires, waste tires, or other used tires, from certain statutory provisions
Title
Exempting businesses transporting scrap tires, waste tires, or other used tires, from certain statutory provisions
Sponsors
Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Evan Hansen [D] |
Del. Kevan Bartlett [R] | Del. Joe Jeffries [R] | Del. Jeff Campbell [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 244) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 189) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 63) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 189) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 63) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Approved by Governor 3/4/20 |
2020-03-05 | House | Approved by Governor 3/4/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/4/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/27/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/27/20 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Governor 2/27/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 244) |
2020-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 189) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 63) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24A | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |