WV HB4022 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide an exemption from the consumer sales and service tax and use tax for certain services and tangible personal property sold for the repair, remodeling and maintenance of aircraft operated under a fractional ownership program.
Title
Exempting the consumer sales and service tax and use tax for services for the repair, remodeling and maintenance of certain aircraft
Sponsors
Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] |
Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Sen. Bennett Queen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 180) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 180) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/8/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/18 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 284) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/27/18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 180) |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | House | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-31 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-11 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-11 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Finance |
2018-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB131 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Economic Development
SB311 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - To House Finance
SB311 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - To House Finance