WV HB4015 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 36, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Vertical Real Estate Management and Availability Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Broadband Enhancement and Expansion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 761) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 545) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 250) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 36, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 761)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenateFloor Title amendment adopted
2020-03-07SenateCom Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 545)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending
2020-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-05SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-21SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-21SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-20HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-20HousePassed House (Roll No. 250)
2020-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-20HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-19HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-19HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-18HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-18HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-06HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-09HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-01-09HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-09HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary
2020-01-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31G13Amended CodeCitation Text
31G51New CodeSee Bill Text
31G52New CodeSee Bill Text
31G53New CodeSee Bill Text
31G54New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4015&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4015%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4015
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4015%20SUB.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4015
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4015%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4015
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4015%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4015
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00250.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0545.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00761.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback