WV HB4015 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill, making appropriations of public money out of the treasury in accordance with section fifty-one, article six of the Constitution
Title
Budget Bill, making appropriations of public money out of the treasury in accordance with section fifty-one, article six of the Constitution
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 345) (Y: 22 N: 73 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 344) (Y: 48 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 343) (Y: 45 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 344) (Y: 48 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 343) (Y: 45 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | House | Tabled on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar, until 3/8/14 |
2014-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 345) |
2014-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 344) |
2014-03-07 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 343) |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2014-03-06 | House | Amendments pending |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-01-08 | House | To House Finance |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-08 | House | To Finance |
2014-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB306 (Same As) 2014-04-14 - Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2014