WV HB4014 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prevent the State Board of Education from implementing common core academic standards and assessments; to establish a process and criteria for the state to develop alternate academic standards and assessments; to prohibit the state board from entering into any agreement which requires implementation of common core standards or limits Constitutional authority and obligation to provide a thorough and efficient system of education; and requiring the state board to report to the Legislative Oversight Commission on Education and Accountability. Strike‑throughs indicate language that would be stricken from a heading or the present law, and underscoring indicates new language that would be added.
Title
Preventing the State Board of Education from implementing common core academic standards and assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 503) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 556) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 386) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 208) (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Motion to table pending amend/bill rejected (Roll No. 204) (Y: 15 N: 80 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 203) (Y: 29 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 202) (Y: 49 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 201) (Y: 30 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 556) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 386) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 208) (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Motion to table pending amend/bill rejected (Roll No. 204) (Y: 15 N: 80 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 203) (Y: 29 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 202) (Y: 49 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 201) (Y: 30 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 503) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 556) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 386) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amends pend. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendments Reported |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2016-02-27 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-27 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-26 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 208) |
2016-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Motion to table pending amend/bill rejected (Roll No. 204) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 203) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 202) |
2016-02-25 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 201) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-02 | House | To House Education |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-02 | House | To Education |
2016-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB499 (Similar To) 2016-02-03 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |