WV HB4013 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


The purpose of this bill is to clarify venue in West Virginia state courts as it applies to nonresidents of the state, and to provide that nonresidents generally may not bring an action in the state unless a substantial part of the acts or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred in the state in order to preserve access to West Virginia courts for West Virginia residents and nonresidents who are actually injured in the state. This bill also reflects the decision of the Supreme Court of the United States in Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. v. Superior Court of California, 137 S. Ct. 1773 (2017), which requires that nonresident plaintiffs have a “connection between the forum and the specific claims at issue” that amounts to the nonresident plaintiffs alleging that they suffered harm in the forum state, in order for courts to claim specific jurisdiction. Id. at 1781. As the Supreme Court has previously announced, “[a] corporation’s ‘continuous activity of some sorts within a state is not enough to support the demand that the corporation be amenable to suits unrelated to that activity.” Id. (quoting Goodyear Dunlop Tire Operations, S.A. v. Brown, 564 U.S. 915, 927 (2011).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Clarifying venue in West Virginia state courts as it applies to nonresidents of the state


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 491) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 492) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House refused to concur and requested Senate to recede (Roll No. 271) (Y: 25 N: 71 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 74) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 7) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-10SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-10SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-10SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 491)
2018-03-10SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-09HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 492)
2018-03-09HouseConference report received-House
2018-03-06HouseConference report filed - House
2018-03-06SenateConference report filed - Senate
2018-03-06HouseResolution adopted to extend conference
2018-03-03SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-02HouseTo conference
2018-03-02HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-02HouseHouse appointed conferees: Hanshaw, Moore, Lovejoy
2018-03-02HouseHouse agreed to conference
2018-03-02HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-02SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-02SenateSenate appoints conference committee: Trump, Weld, Baldwin
2018-03-02SenateSenate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote)
2018-03-02SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-01HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-01HouseHouse refused to concur and requested Senate to recede (Roll No. 271)
2018-03-01HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-02-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-02-06SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 74)
2018-02-06SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-05SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-05SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-02SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-02SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-01SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2018-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-23SenateHouse Message received
2018-01-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-01-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 7)
2018-01-22HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-22HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2018-01-19HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-19HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2018-01-18HouseRead 1st time
2018-01-18HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2018-01-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-01-12HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-01-12HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-12HouseTo Judiciary
2018-01-12HouseFiled for introduction


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1422aAmended CodeCitation Text
5611Amended CodeCitation Text
5611aRepealed CodeCitation Text
69A6Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-06-0074.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00271.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00492.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-10-0491.pdf

Bill Comments