WV HB4011 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require agencies, when submitting a new rule or changes to an existing rule, to also identify two existing rules that could be repealed.
Title
Requiring agencies, when submitting a new rule or changes, to also identify two existing rules that could be repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 179) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 179) |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29A | 3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29A | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |