WV HB4010 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that a religious representative or spiritual assembly, church or religious organization is not required to solemnize a marriage and a spiritual assembly, church or religious organization is not required to allow any building or property of the organization to be used to host a marriage ceremony if the marriage does not conform to the religious representative or spiritual assembly, church or religious organization’s sincerely held religious beliefs, to provide that a religious representative or spiritual assembly, church or religious organization is not subject to civil or criminal liability for such a denial, and to provide that the state and political subdivisions may not penalize or withhold benefits to any religious representative or spiritual assembly, church or religious organization for such a denial.
Title
Providing no requirement to perform or host a marriage ceremony that does not conform to sincerely held religious beliefs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 30) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-31 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 30) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-26 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Do pass |
2018-01-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |