WV HB4009 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the state Settlement and Recovered Funds Accountability Act. The bill requires the deposit of settlement moneys and recovered funds to be deposited in the general revenue. The bill additionally creates an Attorney General Litigation Fund for deposit of attorney fees and costs. The bill also requires certain reporting to be provided by the Attorney General.
Title
State Settlement and Recovered Funds Accountability Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 515) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 515) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 513) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 512) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 425) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 414) (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 93) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 92) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 515) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 513) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 512) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 425) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 414) (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 93) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 92) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 515) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 515) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 513) |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 512) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 425) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 414) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 93) |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 92) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-17 | House | To House Finance |
2018-01-17 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-12 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 3 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 3A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 3A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 3A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 3A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 3A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 3A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |