WV HB4004 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the West Virginia Sentencing Commission
Title
Creating the West Virginia Sentencing Commission
Sponsors
Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Terry Waxman [R] | Del. Caleb Hanna [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] |
Del. Andrew Robinson [D] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 624) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 701) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 700) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 521) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 520) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 4) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 701) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 700) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 521) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 520) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 4) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 624) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | House requests Senate to concur in changed effective date |
2020-03-07 | House | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 701) |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 700) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 521) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 520) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 4) |
2020-01-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 9C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 9C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 9C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 9C | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 9C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 9C | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |