WV HB4003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to telehealth insurance requirements
Title
Relating to telehealth insurance requirements
Sponsors
Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] |
Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Terrishie Sypolt [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 619) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 685) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 487) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 126) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 685) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 487) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 126) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 190, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 619) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 685) |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 487) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 126) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 16 | 7b | New Code | See Bill Text |