WV HB4003 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Referred to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Referred to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the law governing the duties of professional licensing boards
Title
Clarifying the law governing the duties of professional licensing boards
Sponsors
Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. Barbara Hatfield [D] | Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Jim Morgan [D] |
Del. Margaret Staggers [D] | Del. Dale Stephens [D] | Del. Joe Talbott [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Motion | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass with amends and title amend; but first toJudiciary | |
2012-01-26 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-26 | House Message received | |
2012-01-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-01-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 15) | |
2012-01-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-01-25 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-01-24 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | Read 1st time | |
2012-01-23 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-20 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-12 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-12 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |