WV HB3548 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for uniform procedures, agreement forms and benefits to ensure a teacher's exchange of his or her duty-free lunch to perform duties at the school is a voluntary exchange..
Title
Relating to teacher duty-free lunch and daily planning periods
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 230) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-24 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-24 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 230) |
2023-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-23 | House | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | To House Education |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-14 | House | To Education |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |