WV HB3542 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 51, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to expire funds from the aforesaid account to another account in the fiscal year 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expiring funds to the Department of Administration, Board of Risk and Insurance Management, Public Entity Insurance Trust Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 496) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 496) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 495) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 614) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 613) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseChapter 51, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
2023-03-16HouseApproved by Governor 3/16/2023
2023-03-11HouseApproved by Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11SenateApproved by Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-11SenateTo Governor 3/15/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-15HouseTo Governor 3/15/2023
2023-03-11HouseTo Governor 3/15/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11HouseHouse received Senate message
2023-03-10SenateCompleted legislative action
2023-03-10SenateCommunicated to House
2023-03-10SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 496)
2023-03-10SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 496)
2023-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2023-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2023-03-10SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 495)
2023-03-10SenateRead 1st time
2023-03-10SenateImmediate consideration
2023-03-10SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2023-03-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-03-09HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 614)
2023-03-09HousePassed House (Roll No. 613)
2023-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2023-03-09HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-08HouseRead 2nd time
2023-03-08HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-07HouseRead 1st time
2023-03-07HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-06HouseDo pass
2023-02-14HouseTo House Finance
2023-02-14HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-14HouseTo Finance
2023-02-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback