WV HB3493 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to prohibit certain foreign ownership of land in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting certain foreign ownership of agricultural land

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 278) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2023-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2023-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-02-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-02-25HousePassed House (Roll No. 278)
2023-02-25HouseRead 3rd time
2023-02-25HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-24HouseRead 2nd time
2023-02-24HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-23HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-23HouseFrom Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2023-02-23HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2023-02-21HousePlaced on House Calendar
2023-02-21HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-20HouseDo pass
2023-02-14HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-02-14HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-14HouseTo Judiciary
2023-02-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36121ANew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback