WV HB3473 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create a work group to create procedures and policies and a plan for the construction of a database with information necessary for infrastructure maintenance and development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a workgroup relating to Dig Once Policy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-11 - House - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 749) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 748) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 547) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 547) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 276) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 275) (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseChapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
2023-03-28HouseApproved by Governor 3/28/2023
2023-03-11HouseApproved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11SenateApproved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-11SenateTo Governor 3/27/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-27HouseTo Governor 3/27/2023
2023-03-11HouseTo Governor 3/27/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11SenateHouse Message received
2023-03-11HouseCompleted legislative action
2023-03-11HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-03-11HouseEffective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 749)
2023-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 748)
2023-03-11HouseHouse received Senate message
2023-03-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2023-03-10SenateEffective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 547)
2023-03-10SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 547)
2023-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2023-03-10SenateRearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee
2023-03-10SenateOn 3rd reading
2023-03-09SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2023-03-09SenateOn 2nd reading
2023-03-08SenateRead 1st time
2023-03-08SenateImmediate consideration
2023-03-08SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2023-02-27SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2023-02-27SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2023-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-02-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-02-25HouseEffective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 276)
2023-02-25HousePassed House (Roll No. 275)
2023-02-25HouseRead 3rd time
2023-02-25HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-24HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-02-24HouseRead 2nd time
2023-02-24HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-23HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-23HouseFrom Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2023-02-23HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2023-02-21HousePlaced on House Calendar
2023-02-21HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-20HouseDo pass
2023-02-14HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2023-02-14HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-14HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure
2023-02-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
172E10New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3473&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3473%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3473
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3473%20eng.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3473
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3473%20enr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3473
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3473%20hfa%20linville%202-22%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3473%20hfa%20linville%202-22%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3473%20s%20t_i%20am%20_1%203-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3473%20s%20t_i%20amt%20_1%203-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3473%20s%20t_i%20am%20_1%203-8%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3473%20s%20t_i%20amt%20_1%203-8%20adopetd.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=862526703
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=862526686
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00275.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00276.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/03-10-0547.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00748.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00749.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback