WV HB3439 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to limit the civil liability of child placing agencies that obtain an insurance policy in an amount not less than $1 million per incident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To limit the civil liability of child placing agencies that obtain an insurance policy in an amount not less than $1 million per incident

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 757) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 563) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 353) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseChapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
2023-03-28HouseApproved by Governor 3/28/2023
2023-03-11HouseApproved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11SenateApproved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-27HouseTo Governor 3/27/2023
2023-03-11HouseTo Governor 3/27/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11SenateTo Governor 3/27/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-11SenateHouse Message received
2023-03-11HouseCompleted legislative action
2023-03-11HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 757)
2023-03-11HouseHouse received Senate message
2023-03-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2023-03-10SenateTitle amendment adopted
2023-03-10SenateCommittee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent (Voice vote)
2023-03-10SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 563)
2023-03-10SenateAmended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
2023-03-10SenateDeferred until foot of bills
2023-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2023-03-10SenateRearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee
2023-03-10SenateOn 3rd reading
2023-03-09SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-03-09SenateCommittee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2023-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2023-03-09SenateOn 2nd reading
2023-03-08SenateRead 1st time
2023-03-08SenateImmediate consideration
2023-03-08SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2023-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2023-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2023-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 353)
2023-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2023-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-27HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2023-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-25HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-24HouseDo pass
2023-02-13HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-02-13HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-13HouseTo Judiciary
2023-02-13HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
492130New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3439&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3439%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3439
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3439%20eng.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3439
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3439%20enr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3439
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20hfa%20capito%202-27%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20hfa%20capito%202-27%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3439%20s%20jud%20am%20_1%203-6.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3439%20s%20jud%20amt%20_1%203-6.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20sfa%20trump%20_1%203-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20sfat%20trump%20_1%203-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20sfa%20trump%20_1%203-8%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3439%20s%20jud%20am%20_1%203-6%20withdrawn.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20sfa%20woelfel%20_1%203-10.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20sfa%20woelfel%20_1%203-10%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3439%20sfat%20trump%20_1%203-8%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/hb3439%20s%20jud%20amt%20_1%203-6%20withdrawn.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00353.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/03-10-0563.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00757.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback