WV HB3430 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the bureau from assessing a fee upon local health departments.
Title
To prohibit the bureau from assessing a fee upon local health departments
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/20/23 |
2023-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-13 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |