WV HB3371 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the state to utilize the full federal matching requirements for WVU and WVSU.
Title
Relating to federal funds for land-grant institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 471) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 388) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 388) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 471) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 388) |
2023-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-16 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-02-13 | House | To House Education |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-13 | House | To Education then Finance |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |