WV HB3363 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to bring state code into compliance with the Federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act (LEOSA) provision.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 304) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 304) |
2023-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-17 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2023-02-10 | House | To House Jails and Prisons |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-10 | House | To Jails and Prisons then Judiciary |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 3 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |